Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Trumpet Properties, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Gibbins, Carla Ann, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Billy A., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2023 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment - 0310 |
Writ Returned - Final
Date: May 09, 2023Writ of Possession $205
Date: April 19, 2023Writ Returned - Closes Case - (OCA)
Date: May 04, 2023Case Summary
Date: April 24, 2023Letter From Clerk
Date: April 10, 2023Request for Writ of Possession
Date: April 19, 2023Case Summary
Date: April 10, 2023Citation and Return
Date: April 05, 2023Default Judgment (OCA)
Date: April 10, 2023Citation - Eviction
Date: March 13, 2023Original Petition Eviction - (OCA)
Date: March 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned - Final Delivered Delivered Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,133.00Awarded To: TRUMPET PROPERTIESAwarded Against: Carla Gibbins |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned - Closes Case - (OCA) Cancelled Cancelled Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,133.00Awarded To: TRUMPET PROPERTIESAwarded Against: Carla Gibbins |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Summary
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,133.00Awarded To: TRUMPET PROPERTIESAwarded Against: Carla Gibbins |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession $205
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,133.00Awarded To: TRUMPET PROPERTIESAwarded Against: Carla Gibbins |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Possession
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,133.00Awarded To: TRUMPET PROPERTIESAwarded Against: Carla Gibbins |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter From Clerk
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,133.00Awarded To: TRUMPET PROPERTIESAwarded Against: Carla Gibbins |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Summary
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,133.00Awarded To: TRUMPET PROPERTIESAwarded Against: Carla Gibbins |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment (OCA)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,133.00Awarded To: TRUMPET PROPERTIESAwarded Against: Carla Gibbins |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, Billy A., Jr.) 04/03/2023 Reset by Court to 04/10/2023
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,133.00Awarded To: TRUMPET PROPERTIESAwarded Against: Carla Gibbins |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation and Return
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,133.00Awarded To: TRUMPET PROPERTIESAwarded Against: Carla Gibbins |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.