Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pollan, Wd, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Cripps, Briana, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Billy A., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2023 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment - 0310 |
Writ of Possession $205
Date: February 23, 2023Writ Returned - Closes Case - (OCA)
Date: March 02, 2023Letter From Clerk
Date: February 13, 2023Request for Writ of Possession
Date: February 23, 2023Citation - Eviction
Date: January 24, 2023Citation and Return
Date: February 07, 2023Case Summary
Date: February 13, 2023Default Judgment (OCA)
Date: February 13, 2023Original Petition Eviction - (OCA)
Date: January 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned - Closes Case - (OCA)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,318.00Awarded To: WD PollanAwarded Against: Briana Cripps |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession $205
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,318.00Awarded To: WD PollanAwarded Against: Briana Cripps |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Possession
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,318.00Awarded To: WD PollanAwarded Against: Briana Cripps |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter From Clerk
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,318.00Awarded To: WD PollanAwarded Against: Briana Cripps |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Summary
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,318.00Awarded To: WD PollanAwarded Against: Briana Cripps |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment (OCA)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,318.00Awarded To: WD PollanAwarded Against: Briana Cripps |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, Billy A., Jr.)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,318.00Awarded To: WD PollanAwarded Against: Briana Cripps |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation and Return
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,318.00Awarded To: WD PollanAwarded Against: Briana Cripps |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Eviction
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,318.00Awarded To: WD PollanAwarded Against: Briana Cripps |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Eviction - (OCA) LM LM Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,318.00Awarded To: WD PollanAwarded Against: Briana Cripps |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.