Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Keener Breakers , Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Herrera And All Other Occupants, Margaret, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Apffel, D. Blake presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeApffel, D. Blake Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2023 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suited Or Dismissed By Plaintiff - 0360 |
Final Order for NonSuit - Case Close (OCA)
Date: June 27, 2023Motion
Date: June 27, 2023Citation and Return
Date: June 23, 2023Affidavit Alternate Service
Date: June 16, 2023Certificate Of Last Known Address
Date: June 15, 2023Original Petition Eviction - (OCA)
Date: June 14, 2023Non Military Affidavit
Date: June 15, 2023Citation - Eviction
Date: June 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing Case Disposed CANCELED Eviction Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Apffel, D. Blake, Apffel, D. Blake) Case Disposed Judge: Apffel, D. Blake |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Apffel, D. Blake, Apffel, D. Blake) | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Order for NonSuit - Case Close (OCA)
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Non-Suit Non-Suit Judge: Apffel, D. Blake |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation and Return
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Service Herrera And All Other Occupants, Margaret Served 06/16/2023 Returned 06/16/2023
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Summary
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Alternate Service
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Last Known Address
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non Military Affidavit
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.