Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Oaks Texas City Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Delgado, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Apffel, D. Blake presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeApffel, D. Blake Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2023 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeTrial/Hearings By Judge/Hearings Officer - 0330 |
Final Judgment - by Court - (OCA)
Date: June 28, 2023Citation and Return
Date: June 23, 2023Case Summary
Date: June 23, 2023Affidavit Alternate Service
Date: June 15, 2023Credit Card Confirmation
Date: June 15, 2023Citation - Eviction
Date: June 14, 2023Notice to Vacate
Date: June 15, 2023Non Military Affidavit
Date: June 15, 2023Original Petition Eviction - (OCA)
Date: June 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment - by Court - (OCA)
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $1,189.00Awarded To: OAKS TEXAS CITY LLCAwarded Against: Maria Delgado |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Apffel, D. Blake, Apffel, D. Blake)
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $1,189.00Awarded To: OAKS TEXAS CITY LLCAwarded Against: Maria Delgado |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation and Return
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $1,189.00Awarded To: OAKS TEXAS CITY LLCAwarded Against: Maria Delgado |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Summary
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $1,189.00Awarded To: OAKS TEXAS CITY LLCAwarded Against: Maria Delgado |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Service Delgado, Maria Served 06/15/2023 Returned 06/15/2023
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $1,189.00Awarded To: OAKS TEXAS CITY LLCAwarded Against: Maria Delgado |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Alternate Service
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $1,189.00Awarded To: OAKS TEXAS CITY LLCAwarded Against: Maria Delgado |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Credit Card Confirmation
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $1,189.00Awarded To: OAKS TEXAS CITY LLCAwarded Against: Maria Delgado |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to Vacate
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $1,189.00Awarded To: OAKS TEXAS CITY LLCAwarded Against: Maria Delgado |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non Military Affidavit
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $1,189.00Awarded To: OAKS TEXAS CITY LLCAwarded Against: Maria Delgado |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Eviction
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $1,189.00Awarded To: OAKS TEXAS CITY LLCAwarded Against: Maria Delgado |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.