Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Candice Hughes, against Williams, Crystal, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Billy A., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2023 |
CategoryDebt Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Defendant's Original Answer
Date: July 12, 2023Citation - No Fee
Date: June 23, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: July 03, 2023Petition
Date: June 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package No Fee Documents Return of Service Return of Service |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation - No Fee | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation - Service Williams, Crystal Served 07/03/2023 Returned 07/03/2023 | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation - Service Williams, Crystal Unserved | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lead_Petition_eABC_filing_package Petition |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Debt Claims - (OCA) LM LM |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Original Petition Debt Claims - (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.