Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Lacie Elizabeth Friday, against Gutierrez, Gisela M, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Apffel, D. Blake presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeApffel, D. Blake Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2023 |
CategoryDebt Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Motion
Date: September 14, 2023Motion
Date: September 14, 2023Proposed Judgment
Date: September 14, 2023Citation - Paid via EFile
Date: June 16, 2023Motion
Date: September 14, 2023Motion
Date: September 14, 2023Order For Substituted Service
Date: August 09, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: August 10, 2023Proposed Judgment
Date: June 29, 2023Motion
Date: June 29, 2023Petition
Date: June 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non Military Declaration Motion Non Military Declaration |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Motion Exhibit |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Proposed Judgment Default Judgment |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Motion Motion for Entry of Default Judgment |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of last known address Motion Certificate of last known address |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package No Fee Documents Return of Service Return of Service |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order For Substituted Service | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
POS_eABC_Order_133395750 Proposed Judgment |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lead_RequestforFiling_eABC_filing_package Motion |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation - Paid via EFile |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.