Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nguyen, Tuc Anh, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Shadi F. Rafeedie, against Lippert, Kirk Allen, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Jones, Jeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2023 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Order for Substituted Service
Date: September 11, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 06, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: September 06, 2023Motion for Substituted Service
Date: September 06, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: August 08, 2023Receipt Acknowledge
Date: July 28, 2023Receipt Acknowledge
Date: July 28, 2023Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: July 28, 2023Status Conference Sheet
Date: July 28, 2023Original Petition - OCA
Date: July 28, 2023Request for Civil Service
Date: July 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Jeth) | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER GRT SUB OF SERVICE SIGNED ORDER GRT SUB OF SERVICE SIGNED |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Substituted Service (Judicial Officer: Jones, Jeth ) No request nor fees paid at this time No request nor fees paid at this time |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order for Substituted Service Proposed Order (unsigned) Order for Substituted Service Order for Substituted Service |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Submission-Motion for Substituted Service Notice of Hearing Notice of Submission-Motion for Substituted Service |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitute Service Motion for Substituted Service Plaintiff's Motion for Substituted Service Plaintiff's Motion for Substituted Service |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Jones, Jeth ) notice of case setting/action:status conference -appearance required 10/26/2023@9:30AM notice of case setting/action:status conference -appearance required 10/26/2023@9:30AM |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Re: Citation Issuance Re: Citation Issuance |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Emailed Status Conference Sheet to Atty. Emailed Status Conference Sheet to Atty. |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 Citation and Emailed to Attorney Issued 1 Citation and Emailed to Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.