Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
3M Company filed a(n) Other Civil - Other Pretrial Matters case represented by Denise U. Scofield, against Martin, Michael B., Martin Walton Law Firm, represented by David L. Miller, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil - Other Pretrial Matters |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Copy of Notice
Date: July 13, 2023Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: June 30, 2023Appeal - Order
Date: June 30, 2023Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: July 01, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: April 25, 2023Correspondence from Court
Date: June 05, 2023Order
Date: June 02, 2023Response
Date: June 01, 2023Correspondence from Attorney
Date: June 07, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: June 27, 2023Reply
Date: May 30, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: April 25, 2023Response
Date: April 21, 2023Supplement
Date: March 31, 2023Correspondence from Attorney
Date: March 30, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: March 29, 2023Motion
Date: March 29, 2023Motion
Date: March 29, 2023Motion
Date: March 29, 2023Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 28, 2023Motion
Date: March 29, 2023Status Conference Sheet
Date: March 28, 2023Request for Hearing
Date: March 27, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 27, 2023Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Check Status (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) OF APPEAL OF 6/2/23 ORDER. 09/01/2023 Reset by Court to 09/29/2023 OF APPEAL OF 6/2/23 ORDER. |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Other CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Other IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. 06/29/2023 Reset by Court to 08/10/2023 |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
July 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Re: Petition for Mandaums Filed. Re: Petition for Mandaums Filed. |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Re: Order Issued - Distribution Letter. Re: Order Issued - Distribution Letter. |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Order Order of Stay; Sent to CRT HP Queue Order of Stay; Sent to CRT HP Queue |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) notice the court has reset the status conference to 08/10/2023@9:00AM notice the court has reset the status conference to 08/10/2023@9:00AM |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court Correspondence from Attorney Re: Order Granting Petition 202; Copy of Order attached. Re: Order Granting Petition 202; Copy of Order attached. |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court attached is copy of the order granting verified petition to take depositions before suit to investigate potential claims attached is copy of the order granting verified petition to take depositions before suit to investigate potential claims |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) Granting verified petition to take depos before suit to investigate claims Granting verified petition to take depos before suit to investigate claims |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.