Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mccormick, Terry, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Eskridge, Alice Marie, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Billy A., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2022 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeTrial/Hearings By Judge/Hearings Officer - 0330 |
Request for Writ of Possession
Date: October 26, 2022Abstract of Judgment $5
Date: October 26, 2022Writ of Possession $205
Date: October 26, 2022Case Summary
Date: October 17, 2022Final Judgment - by Court - (OCA)
Date: October 17, 2022Citation and Return
Date: October 06, 2022Citation - Eviction
Date: October 03, 2022Original Petition Eviction - (OCA)
Date: October 03, 2022Citation - Eviction $75
Date: October 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Possession
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $2,281.00Awarded To: Terry McCormickAwarded Against: Alice Eskridge |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment $5
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $2,281.00Awarded To: Terry McCormickAwarded Against: Alice Eskridge |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession $205
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $2,281.00Awarded To: Terry McCormickAwarded Against: Alice Eskridge |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Summary
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $2,281.00Awarded To: Terry McCormickAwarded Against: Alice Eskridge |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment - by Court - (OCA)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $2,281.00Awarded To: Terry McCormickAwarded Against: Alice Eskridge |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, Billy A., Jr.)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $2,281.00Awarded To: Terry McCormickAwarded Against: Alice Eskridge |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation and Return
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $2,281.00Awarded To: Terry McCormickAwarded Against: Alice Eskridge |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation - Eviction $75 Citation - Eviction Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $2,281.00Awarded To: Terry McCormickAwarded Against: Alice Eskridge |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation - Service Eskridge, Alice Marie Served 10/04/2022 Returned 10/06/2022
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $2,281.00Awarded To: Terry McCormickAwarded Against: Alice Eskridge |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Eviction - (OCA) LM LM Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $2,281.00Awarded To: Terry McCormickAwarded Against: Alice Eskridge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.