Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Credit Corp Solutions Inc., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Matthew W. Cooper, against Calvo, Alexander, represented by Michael W. Weston, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with McCumber, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2022 |
CategoryDebt Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suited Or Dismissed By Plaintiff - 0360 |
Dismissed - OCA
Date: September 11, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: September 05, 2023Notice
Date: September 05, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: September 05, 2023Notice
Date: September 01, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: February 03, 2023Notice
Date: August 26, 2022Citation - No Fee
Date: July 14, 2022Answer
Date: August 26, 2022Petition
Date: July 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissed - OCA Emailed to courts@scott-pc.com - AB Emailed to courts@scott-pc.com - AB |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
2142576_DSO_eABC No Fee Documents Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
2142576_DSN_eABC Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
2142576_DSL_eABC No Fee Documents Cover Letter Cover Letter |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sugg of BK-Credit Corp Notice Suggestion of bankruptcy Suggestion of bankruptcy |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
2142576-D1-NS-147078 Affidavit of Nonservice No Fee Documents 2142576-D1-NS-147078 Affidavit of Nonservice |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Notice Notice of Appearance |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer - TX JP Answer Defendant Original Answer Defendant Original Answer |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation - No Fee -Iss. Cit.-emailed to scottassociatesfilings@proofserve.com--DG -Iss. Cit.-emailed to scottassociatesfilings@proofserve.com--DG |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT - TX 2142576-147079 Petition Complaint - TX 2142576-147079 Complaint - TX 2142576-147079 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.