Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Conn Appliances Inc., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Matthew W. Cooper, against Chacon, Belia, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Rikard, Gregory L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRikard, Gregory L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2022 |
CategoryDebt Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment - 0310 |
Default Judgment (OCA)
Date: January 23, 2023Default Judgment (OCA)
Date: January 17, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 17, 2023Service Return
Date: May 06, 2022Citation - Paid via EFile
Date: May 02, 2022Petition
Date: April 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment (OCA)
Judge: Rikard, Gregory L. Judgment of $2,421.26Awarded To: Conn Appliances Inc.Awarded Against: Belia Chacon |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
2061441_Motion (No Fee) Default Judgment (OCA) Judge: Rikard, Gregory L. Judgment of $2,421.26Awarded To: Conn Appliances Inc.Awarded Against: Belia Chacon |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
2061441_Proposed Order Proposed Order Judge: Rikard, Gregory L. Judgment of $2,421.26Awarded To: Conn Appliances Inc.Awarded Against: Belia Chacon |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Lead_Proof_eABC_filing_package Service Return Judge: Rikard, Gregory L. Judgment of $2,421.26Awarded To: Conn Appliances Inc.Awarded Against: Belia Chacon |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation - Paid via EFile
Judge: Rikard, Gregory L. Judgment of $2,421.26Awarded To: Conn Appliances Inc.Awarded Against: Belia Chacon |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
ScottParnell_2061441_let_eABC Petition Judge: Rikard, Gregory L. Judgment of $2,421.26Awarded To: Conn Appliances Inc.Awarded Against: Belia Chacon |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Debt Claims - (OCA)
Judge: Rikard, Gregory L. Judgment of $2,421.26Awarded To: Conn Appliances Inc.Awarded Against: Belia Chacon |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.