Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Baukus, Nicole Nadra, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Julie A Ketterman, against Engle, Scott J., Nash, Jamie B., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 02, 2022 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is a plaintiff's original petition filed by Nicole Nadra Baukus against Scott J. Engle, Jamie B. Nash, and Scott J. Engle doing business as Montgomery County Police Reporter. The plaintiff requests that discovery be conducted under Dis...
Request for Hearing
Date: August 05, 2022Response
Date: August 05, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: August 04, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 07, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: August 10, 2022Amended Petition
Date: July 07, 2022Motion
Date: August 02, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Non Suit - Partial
Date: July 07, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: June 24, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: June 24, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 31, 2022Response
Date: June 14, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 31, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 31, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: May 06, 2022Request for Civil Service
Date: May 03, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 31, 2022Original Answer
Date: May 31, 2022Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 02, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: May 03, 2022Correspondence
Date: May 06, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: May 03, 2022Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: May 03, 2022Status Conference Sheet
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: January 10, 2023Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: December 31, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 02, 2023Request for Hearing
Date: January 04, 2023Correspondence
Date: January 04, 2023Notice of Appearance
Date: December 29, 2022Appeal - Assignment Letter to the Court of Appeals
Date: January 02, 2023Motion to Modify
Date: December 29, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: December 30, 2022Appeal - Assignment Letter to the Court of Appeals
Date: December 30, 2022Appeal - Assignment Letter to the Court of Appeals
Date: December 30, 2022Designation of Attorney of Record
Date: December 29, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: December 29, 2022Order
Date: December 30, 2022Exhibit(s) - Checked Out
Date: December 30, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: December 30, 2022Notice of Appeal
Date: December 29, 2022Returned Mail Undeliverable
Date: December 08, 2022Notice of Appeal
Date: December 29, 2022Exhibit Inventory Filed by Court Reporter
Date: December 06, 2022Request for Copies
Date: November 04, 2022Order on Motion for Sanctions
Date: November 29, 2022Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: October 12, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: December 05, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: October 11, 2022Appeal - Clerk Record - File Copy
Date: October 11, 2022Request for Clerk Record on Appeal
Date: October 03, 2022Returned Mail Undeliverable
Date: September 12, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: September 30, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: August 30, 2022Notice of Appeal
Date: September 28, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: September 15, 2022Returned Mail Undeliverable
Date: September 30, 2022Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: September 30, 2022Appeal - Assignment Letter to the Court of Appeals
Date: September 30, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: September 28, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: August 25, 2022Reply
Date: August 29, 2022Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA
Date: August 29, 2022Response
Date: August 29, 2022Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: August 26, 2022Exhibit(s)
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: August 10, 2022Objection
Date: August 26, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: August 05, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on Joint Motion to Modify, Vacate, and Set Aside the November 29, 2022 Order of Sanctions Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on Joint Motion to Modify, Vacate, and Set Aside the November 29, 2022 Order of Sanctions |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
P. Order Granting Joint Mtn. to Vacate, Modify, & Set Aside November 29, 2022 Order of Sanctions Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Granting Joint Motion to Vacate, Modify, and Set Aside November 29, 2022 Order of Sanctions Order Granting Joint Motion to Vacate, Modify, and Set Aside November 29, 2022 Order of Sanctions |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Hearing-motion to set aside/vacate Request for Hearing motion to set aside/vacate motion to set aside/vacate |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence CRT of Appeals Case Detail. CLR Due to file by 03/29/2023 CRT of Appeals Case Detail. CLR Due to file by 03/29/2023 |
|
January 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email confirmation of Amended Notice of Assignment Email confirmation of Amended Notice of Assignment |
|
January 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Assignment Letter to the Court of Appeals Amended Assignment letter filed with 14th Ct of Appeals-mailed to atty's-Hand-Delivered to Ct. Reporter Amended Assignment letter filed with 14th Ct of Appeals-mailed to atty's-Hand-Delivered to Ct. Reporter |
|
December 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal to CRT Reporter. CLR due to file by Monday, January 30, 2023. 1/4/2023 - CLR due to file by March 29, 2023. to CRT Reporter. CLR due to file by Monday, January 30, 2023. 1/4/2023 - CLR due to file by March 29, 2023. |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email confirmation of Notice of Assignment Email confirmation of Notice of Assignment |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Assignment Letter to the Court of Appeals Ketterman-Filed with the 14th Ct of Appeals-mailed to atty's-Hand-Delivered to Ct. Reporter Ketterman-Filed with the 14th Ct of Appeals-mailed to atty's-Hand-Delivered to Ct. Reporter |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Assignment Letter to the Court of Appeals Filed with 14th Ct of Appeakls-mailed to atty's-Hand-Delivered to Ct. Reporter Filed with 14th Ct of Appeakls-mailed to atty's-Hand-Delivered to Ct. Reporter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.