Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Texas City Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Guzman, Evangelina Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: June 23, 2021Tax Notice
Date: September 16, 2022Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA
Date: October 04, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 02, 2022Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: August 02, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: August 11, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 25, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: August 02, 2022Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 25, 2021Original Petition - Tax
Date: June 23, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: June 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT (FINAL OCA) Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA NOTICE OF NONSUIT-FINAL Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA NOTICE OF NONSUIT-FINAL |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL Tax Notice NOTICE OF TRIAL |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - Executed - EVANGELINA HERNANDEZ GUZMAN Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena NOTICE OF CITATION - EXECUTED - 21-TX-0357 - EVANGELINA HERNANDEZ GUZMAN NOTICE OF CITATION - EXECUTED - 21-TX-0357 - EVANGELINA HERNANDEZ GUZMAN |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of e citation of e citation |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 1 citation issued @ $8.00. Emailed to attorney 1 citation issued @ $8.00. Emailed to attorney |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request For Service - Evangelina Hernandez Guzman (RI) - PPS Tax Service Request 1 citation to be issued. Assigned to MM 1 citation to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of e citation of e citation |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 1 citation issued @ $8.00. Emailed to attorney 1 citation issued @ $8.00. Emailed to attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.