Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Darring, Anne B.) | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product -GB -GB |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Email Verification - Service Receipt -GB -GB |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Service 11/04/2021- Iss 1 cit - Emailed to Petitioner - GB 11/04/2021- Iss 1 cit - Emailed to Petitioner - GB |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition FIRST AMENDED Petition for Divorce FIRST AMENDED Petition for Divorce |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Darring, Anne B.) | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Report sent to Court sent to Court |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Information for Parties STATUS CONFERENCE AND INFO FOR PRO SE PARTIES and Friend of the Court Covid packet aj STATUS CONFERENCE AND INFO FOR PRO SE PARTIES and Friend of the Court Covid packet aj |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - OCA for Divorce for Divorce |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.