Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mcguire, Annette Renee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcguire, Corey Sheldon, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Anna B. Darring presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnna B. Darring Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Motion
Date: October 04, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 04, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 25, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Darring, Anne B.) | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Darring, Anne B.) | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Enforce Judgment (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Darring, Anne B.) | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce - Temporary Orders Motion for Enforcement Motion for Enforcement |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of De Novo Hearing Notice of De Novo Hearing |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Darring, Anne B.) Result: Held | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Report jt jt |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders (Judicial Officer: Darring, Anne B. ) -lw -lw |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Judgment with Exhibit Motion Motion to Enter Judgment with Exhibit |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of Temporary Orders Proposed Order (unsigned) Temporary Orders Temporary Orders |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.