Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mcfarlane, Micah, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Erick Delarue, against U.S. Bank, N.A., represented by Michael F. Hord, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Foreclosure Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Notice of Removal
Date: August 12, 2021Original Answer
Date: August 12, 2021Order for Non Suit - Partial
Date: August 11, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Non Suit - Partial
Date: August 10, 2021Amended Petition
Date: August 10, 2021Original Answer
Date: August 10, 2021Bond - Certificate of Cash in Lieu of
Date: July 30, 2021Temporary Restraining Order - Issued - Work Product
Date: July 30, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: July 30, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: July 30, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: July 30, 2021Temporary Restraining Order - OCA
Date: July 30, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: July 30, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: July 30, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 30, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: July 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Case Disposed |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Case Disposed CANCELED Temporary Orders (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Case Disposed 30/1 hr in person hearing |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT S FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL Notice of Removal DEFENDANT S FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT S ORIGINAL ANSWER Original Answer DEFENDANT S ORIGINAL ANSWER |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Non Suit - Partial (Judicial Officer: Judge, Visiting ) as to Select Portfolio Services, Inc. as to Select Portfolio Services, Inc. |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED - ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF NONSUIT W/O PREJUDICE LB/JF SIGNED - ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF NONSUIT W/O PREJUDICE LB/JF |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL Proposed Order (unsigned) NOTICE OF NON-SUIT. NOTICE OF NON-SUIT. |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-SUIT. Notice of Non Suit - Partial NOTICE OF NON-SUIT. |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
FIRST AMENDED PEITION Amended Petition FIRST AMENDED PETITION FIRST AMENDED PETITION |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT S ORIGINAL ANSWER - McFarlane Original Answer DEFENDANT S ORIGINAL ANSWER DEFENDANT S ORIGINAL ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.