Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of The West, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ellis, Scott D., Scott D. Ellis, against Degnan, Robert Gordon, Simmers, Sandra Jean, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 29, 2021Order
Date: January 28, 2022Citation and Return
Date: October 27, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 27, 2022Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: January 27, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: October 27, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: October 27, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: October 21, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: October 21, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: October 21, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: October 21, 2021Citation Returned Unexecuted
Date: October 07, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: October 01, 2021Order for Substituted Service
Date: September 24, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: October 01, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 24, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: September 24, 2021Motion for Substituted Service
Date: September 24, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 29, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 29, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 29, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: June 29, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 29, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 29, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit Without Prejudice Order (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) Order of Nonsuit Without Prejudice |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED- ORDER OF NONSUIT W/O PREJUDICE//LC/re SIGNED- ORDER OF NONSUIT W/O PREJUDICE//LC/re |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit Proposed Order (unsigned) Order of Nonsuit |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) 09/30/2021 Reset by Court to 12/16/2021 | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation and Return | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service_001 Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Return of Service P287187_001.pdf Return of Service P287187_001 |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Return of Service P287187_002.pdf Return of Service P287187_002 |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request - Simmers Request for Civil Service Civil Process Request - Sandra Jean Simmers Civil Process Request - Sandra Jean Simmers |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.