Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pca Acquisitions V, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by David Lippman, against Williams, Howard, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Request for Civil Service
Date: June 28, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 01, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: January 31, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: December 16, 2021Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA
Date: January 27, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: December 16, 2021Original Answer
Date: October 28, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 28, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: September 07, 2021Correspondence from Pro Se Party
Date: September 20, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 28, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: June 28, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 28, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 28, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 28, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
P. ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT Proposed Order (unsigned) Proposed Order of Default Proposed Order of Default |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismiss - Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) 01/27/2022 Reset by Court to 01/27/2022 | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes dwop order signed dwop order signed |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) Case is set on the Dismissal Docket for 01/27/2022 at 9:00 am Case is set on the Dismissal Docket for 01/27/2022 at 9:00 am |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes deft appeared again (2nd time) and again no appearance by pltf - case set for dwop deft appeared again (2nd time) and again no appearance by pltf - case set for dwop |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) deft appeared at last sc deft appeared at last sc |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant used citation return form as his origanl answer form. Defendant used citation return form as his origanl answer form. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.