Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pca Acquisitions V, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by David Lippman, against Jeffords, Sam, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Kerry L. Neves presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKerry L. Neves Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA
Date: September 23, 2021Original Answer
Date: July 07, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER ON CASE FOR DWOP - FAILURE TO APPEAR SIGNED BY JUDGE KLN/as ORDER ON CASE FOR DWOP - FAILURE TO APPEAR SIGNED BY JUDGE KLN/as |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena RETURN OF SERVICE - Sam Jefords RETURN OF SERVICE - Sam Jefords |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email receipt from Attorney re: Issuance of 1 citation Email receipt from Attorney re: Issuance of 1 citation |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Sheet E-Mailed to atty 6-24-21 E-Mailed to atty 6-24-21 |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge e-mail receipt from atty for S/C sheet e-mail receipt from atty for S/C sheet |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 citation and emailed to Attorney Issued 1 citation and emailed to Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.