Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Painted Meadows Community Association, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Miller, Rick J., against Garcia, Roy, Jr., Morris, Courtney, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Real Property - Ownership/Title |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: September 23, 2021Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: September 29, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 24, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 23, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 23, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 23, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: June 23, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) Case Disposed |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED- AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT//LC/re SIGNED- AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT//LC/re |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order-Agreed Final Judgment Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Final Judgment |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) status conference reset on 10/21/2021@9:30AM status conference reset on 10/21/2021@9:30AM |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email receipt from Attorney re: Issuance of 2 citations Email receipt from Attorney re: Issuance of 2 citations |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 2 citations and emailed to Attorney Issued 2 citations and emailed to Attorney |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Civil Service 2 citations to issue assigned to SO 2 citations to issue assigned to SO |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Sheet e-mailed to atty. e-mailed to atty. |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
20210621 POP Original Petition - OCA PM v. Garcia/Morris PM v. Garcia/Morris |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.