Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dac Worldwide, Llc, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Keith Wier, against Draper, Bill, Sim Plant Training, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 16, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: April 16, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: September 12, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 08, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 06, 2023Motion for Default Judgment
Date: March 29, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: March 31, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: September 06, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 29, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: October 29, 2021Judgment - Final - Default - OCA
Date: March 30, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: March 21, 2022Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: September 09, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: October 26, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: April 16, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: April 16, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: September 01, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: July 12, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: April 16, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: April 16, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: April 16, 2021OCA Case Information Sheet
Date: April 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) MTN TO COMPEL / SANCTIONS MTN TO COMPEL / SANCTIONS |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) notice of setting on plt's mnt to compel/sactions on 10/03/2023@9:30AM notice of setting on plt's mnt to compel/sactions on 10/03/2023@9:30AM |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
P. Order-Request for Hearing MTC Proposed Order (unsigned) Order-Request for Hearing MTC Order-Request for Hearing MTC |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes MTN TO COMPEL / SANCTIONS SEEN BY COURT; NO REQUET FOR ORAL HEARING OR SUBMISSION//re MTN TO COMPEL / SANCTIONS SEEN BY COURT; NO REQUET FOR ORAL HEARING OR SUBMISSION//re |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions Proposed Order (unsigned) Order on Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions(PJ) Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions(PJ) |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Case Disposed CANCELED Bench Trial (10:01 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) Case Disposed |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment - Final - Default - OCA (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED- DEFAULT JUDGMENT//LC/re SIGNED- DEFAULT JUDGMENT//LC/re |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.