Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
21St Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by K. Clifford Littlefield, against Poston, Michael L., Williams, Renee L., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Request for Civil Service
Date: March 08, 2021Writ of Possession and Return
Date: June 14, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: April 01, 2022Request for Civil Service
Date: March 31, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: August 12, 2021Writ of Possession - Issuance - Work Product
Date: April 01, 2022Writ of Possession and Return
Date: December 14, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: November 19, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: November 22, 2021Writ of Possession - Issuance - Work Product
Date: November 22, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: July 20, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Issuance (Work Product)
Date: July 29, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: July 29, 2021Writ of Possession - Issuance - Work Product
Date: July 29, 2021Judgment - Final - Default - OCA
Date: June 18, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: June 22, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 03, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: June 04, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: May 07, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: June 03, 2021Motion for Default Judgment
Date: June 03, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: May 07, 2021Motion for Substituted Service
Date: April 21, 2021Order for Substituted Service
Date: April 26, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: June 02, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 21, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: March 10, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 10, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 08, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: March 08, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: March 08, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 08, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession and Return | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email confirmation from atty-Re: Writ of Possession Email confirmation from atty-Re: Writ of Possession |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession - Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 Writ of Possession-emailed to atty 4-01-22 lk Issued 1 Writ of Possession-emailed to atty 4-01-22 lk |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Civil Service Request for 90-Day Writ of Possession-assigned to LK Request for 90-Day Writ of Possession-assigned to LK |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession and Return Returned-Per Deft's atty-Bankruptcy filed Returned-Per Deft's atty-Bankruptcy filed |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email confirmation from atty-Re: Writ of Possession Email confirmation from atty-Re: Writ of Possession |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession - Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 Writ of Possession-emailed to atty 11-22-21 lk Issued 1 Writ of Possession-emailed to atty 11-22-21 lk |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rqst Writ Request for Civil Service Request for 90-Day Writ of Possession. Please mail the original 90-Day Writ of Possession to K. Clifford Littlefield, Corpus Christi office. Thanks you. Request for 90-Day Writ of Possession. Please mail the original 90-Day Writ of Possession to K. Clifford Littlefield, Corpus Christi office. Thanks you. |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of bankruptcy filing_Notice of BK_RWilliams1 Notice of Filing Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Stay of Legal Proceedings Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Stay of Legal Proceedings |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issuance (Work Product) Issued 1 Abstract of Judgment-emailed to atty 7-29-21 lk Issued 1 Abstract of Judgment-emailed to atty 7-29-21 lk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.