Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Texas City, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Texas City Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Harris, Renita Gale, Harris, Theresa May, Lewis, Evelyn Marie, Lewis, Regina Fay, Lewis, Roy Lee, Jr., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrady, Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: July 12, 2021Original Answer
Date: October 15, 2021Report
Date: March 08, 2023Citation Returned Unexecuted
Date: October 06, 2021Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: September 27, 2021Order - Tax - Signed by Tax Master
Date: September 15, 2021Tax Proposed Order
Date: September 09, 2021Tax Motion
Date: September 09, 2021Citation by Posting and Return
Date: July 21, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: July 19, 2021Citation by Posting Issuance
Date: July 16, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: July 16, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: July 13, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: July 13, 2021Affidavit
Date: July 13, 2021Original Petition - Tax
Date: July 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) 12/08/2022 Reset by Court to 11/16/2023 | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Harris 21TX0380 230308 AAL report Report AAL report AAL report |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Harris Answer Original Answer AAL Answer AAL Answer |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Unexecuted | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Signed order appointing attorney ad litem pg/ac Signed order appointing attorney ad litem pg/ac |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Tax - Signed by Tax Master Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Master's Recommendation: Appointment of Elizabeth Spears, attorney ad litem, per order filed. TWM Master's Recommendation: Appointment of Elizabeth Spears, attorney ad litem, per order filed. TWM |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Tax Proposed Order ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem Tax Motion PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.