Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Galveston, Galveston College, Galveston County, Galveston Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Pointe San Luis Laguna And Playa Property Owners' Subassociation, Inc., Trimble, Dale L., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House405th District Court |
Tax Service Request
Date: March 19, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 29, 2023Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: March 19, 2021Citation and Return
Date: June 15, 2021Citation and Return
Date: June 17, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: May 24, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: May 24, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: March 19, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: May 20, 2021Original Petition - Tax
Date: March 19, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 19, 2021Original Petition - Tax
Date: March 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) 12/12/2022 Reset by Court to 11/17/2023 | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge CK # $342.00 CK # $342.00 |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation and Return | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation and Return | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 2 citation issued @ $16.00. Emailed to attorney 2 citation issued @ $16.00. Emailed to attorney |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of e citation of e citation |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to Reissue Citations Tax Service Request 2 citations to be issued. Assigned to MM 2 citations to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to Issue Citations Tax Service Request 2 citations to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 2 citations issued @ $16.00. Emailed to attorney 2 citations issued @ $16.00. Emailed to attorney |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to Issue Citations Tax Service Request 2 citations to be issued. Assigned to MM 2 citations to be issued. Assigned to MM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.