Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Texas City, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Texas City Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Texas First Bank, The Harvest Church La Marque, represented by Thea G. Clark, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: January 11, 2021Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA
Date: October 13, 2021Original Answer
Date: July 26, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: January 12, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2021Original Petition - Tax
Date: January 11, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: January 11, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Suit Final OCA Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA Notice of Non-Suit - FINAL OCA Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA Notice of Non-Suit - FINAL OCA |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendants Original Answer - General Denial (00411086xA626F) Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer - General Denial Defendant's Original Answer - General Denial |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Unexecuted - THE HARVEST CHURCH LA MARQUE Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena NOTICE OF CITATION - UNEXECUTED - 21-TX-0007 - THE HARVEST CHURCH LA MARQUE NOTICE OF CITATION - UNEXECUTED - 21-TX-0007 - THE HARVEST CHURCH LA MARQUE |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 2 citation issued @ $16.00. Emailed to attorney 2 citation issued @ $16.00. Emailed to attorney |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of e citation of e citation |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition Original Petition |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Service Tax Service Request 2 citations to be issued. Assigned to MM 2 citations to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Service Tax Service Request 2 citations to be issued. Assigned to MM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.