Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Callens, Christina, C., O., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rodriguez, Jessica, Randall O. Sorrels, against City Of Galveston, Smith, Michael Scott, represented by Robert E. Booth, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: July 12, 2021Certificate
Date: October 28, 2022Order
Date: October 03, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: September 29, 2022Correspondence from Court
Date: August 08, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 05, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: July 05, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: July 05, 2022Order of Dismissal - Non Final
Date: June 30, 2022Correspondence from Court
Date: July 01, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: May 26, 2022Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: May 25, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: March 22, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: May 23, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 23, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 23, 2022Certificate
Date: May 04, 2022Certificate
Date: March 03, 2022Certificate
Date: March 03, 2022Certificate
Date: March 03, 2022Certificate
Date: March 03, 2022Certificate
Date: March 03, 2022Certificate
Date: March 03, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 25, 2022Certificate
Date: February 15, 2022Certificate
Date: March 03, 2022Certificate
Date: February 15, 2022Motion
Date: January 25, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: November 12, 2021Order for Non Suit - Partial
Date: October 14, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: October 14, 2021Jury Demand
Date: October 14, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Non Suit - Partial
Date: October 13, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: August 02, 2021Original Answer
Date: August 13, 2021Correspondence from Court
Date: July 29, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: July 27, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: July 17, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: July 17, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: July 13, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: July 13, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: July 12, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: July 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of CHRISTINA CALLENS Certificate Reporter's Certification of CHRISTINA CALLENS |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) Granting Final Notice of Nonsuit Granting Final Notice of Nonsuit |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER GRANTING FINAL NOTICE OF NONSUIT SIGNED BY JUDGE KLN/as ORDER GRANTING FINAL NOTICE OF NONSUIT SIGNED BY JUDGE KLN/as |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
P. Order - Notice of Non Suit with Prejudice_AF Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Granting Nonsuit Order Granting Nonsuit |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit with Prejudice_AF Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA Notice of Nonsuit Notice of Nonsuit |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Deadline to Complete Matter (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) DEADLINE FOR RECEIPT OF CLOSING PAPERWORK FROM COUNSEL. Result: Held DEADLINE FOR RECEIPT OF CLOSING PAPERWORK FROM COUNSEL. |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Settled CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Settled |
|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court Closing Paperwork Deadline 9/9/22 Closing Paperwork Deadline 9/9/22 |
|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. PLTF'S FIRST AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (FILED 7/5/22). Result: Held IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. PLTF'S FIRST AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (FILED 7/5/22). |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order on Agreed Motion For Continuance Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Granting Agreed Motion for Continuance Order Granting Agreed Motion for Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.