Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Together Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lippman, David, Glen L. Work, against Sawyer, Teresa Mae, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House405th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 29, 2021Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: July 28, 2023Motion for Default Judgment
Date: June 21, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 21, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: May 23, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 28, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 30, 2021Motion to Retain
Date: September 28, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 30, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 30, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: June 30, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 29, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit without PrejudicePDF Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA Notice of Non-Suit without Prejudice Notice of Non-Suit without Prejudice |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Check Status (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) no request for hearing/subm filed regarding mtn for default. If no request filed by this date-set for dwop no request for hearing/subm filed regarding mtn for default. If no request filed by this date-set for dwop |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Default Judgment Proposed Order (unsigned) Order of Default Judgment |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Affidavit of Personal Service Affidavit of Personal Service |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO RETAIN Proposed Order (unsigned) (Proposed) Order on Motion to Retain (Proposed) Order on Motion to Retain |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Retain MOTION TO RETAIN | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 citation and emailed to Attorney Issued 1 citation and emailed to Attorney |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Emailed Status Conf. Sheet to Atty. Emailed Status Conf. Sheet to Atty. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.