Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Connally, Shawn, Galveston County District Attorney, Shawn Connally, against $2,688.00 In U.S. Currency, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllisor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Matters - Seizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 29, 2021Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: August 12, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: August 12, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 11, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: June 29, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 29, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 29, 2021Original Answer
Date: July 29, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 29, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 29, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Other CANCELED Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) Other |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA sent to da Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) sent to da |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Unexecuted Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Citation Returned Unexecuted |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order-Agreed Final Judgment & Order Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Final Judgment & Order Agreed Final Judgment & Order |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Claimant's Original Answer to Notice of Seizure and Intended Forfeiture Original Answer Claimant's Original Answer - sent to da Claimant's Original Answer - sent to da |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition -NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND INTENDED FORFEITURE Original Petition - OCA NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND INTENDED FORFEITURE |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Sheet Emailed to DA's Office (Heather) Emailed to DA's Office (Heather) |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition -NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND INTENDED FORFEITURE Original Petition - OCA NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND INTENDED FORFEITURE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND INTENDED FORFEITURE |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 citation and emailed to DA's Office (Heather) Issued 1 citation and emailed to DA's Office (Heather) |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email receipt from Attorney re: Issuance of 1 citation Email receipt from Attorney re: Issuance of 1 citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.