Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cohen, Janet, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Daniel Goldberg, Goldberg, Daniel, against A. Smecca, Inc., Galveston Restaurant Group, Inc., represented by Chris Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Jones, Jeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 16, 2021Appointment and Fees Report - OCA
Date: February 09, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 11, 2023Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: July 11, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 02, 2023Correspondence
Date: January 31, 2023Designation of Witness
Date: January 13, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: September 16, 2022Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: September 16, 2022Certificate
Date: September 12, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 07, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 07, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: September 07, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: March 11, 2022Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: March 14, 2022Exhibit(s)
Date: February 17, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: February 17, 2022Order for Non Suit - Partial
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Non Suit - Partial
Date: February 08, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 08, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: January 14, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: January 14, 2022Order of Dismissal - Non Final
Date: January 13, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 12, 2022Order Granting Motion
Date: January 13, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: December 08, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: December 08, 2021Reply
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Non Suit - Partial
Date: January 12, 2022Response
Date: November 12, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 12, 2021Exhibit(s)
Date: November 12, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 02, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 03, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: November 01, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 20, 2021Request for Hearing
Date: October 21, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: July 15, 2021Original Answer
Date: September 28, 2021Motion
Date: October 20, 2021Original Answer
Date: July 06, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 17, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: July 01, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 17, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 16, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 16, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: June 16, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 16, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Deadline to Complete Matter Case Disposed CANCELED Deadline to Complete Matter (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Jeth) Case Disposed CLOSING DOCS DUE |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Non-Suit Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Granting Non-Suit |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA Plaintiff''s Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice Plaintiff''s Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Settled CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Jeth) Settled |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Jeth) | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Appointment and Fees Report - OCA (Judicial Officer: Jones, Jeth ) | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fee Report-Mediation Proposed Order (unsigned) Mediator Fee Report Mediator Fee Report |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court-Re: Mediator Settlement Report Correspondence Letter to Court-Re: Mediator Settlement Report |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Expert Designation Designation of Witness Plaintiff's Expert Designations Plaintiff's Expert Designations |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Reset CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) Reset |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.