Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cooper, Matthew W., against Herrod, Marjorie R, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
This complaint is a Plaintiff's Original Petition filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. against Marjorie R Herrod in the District Court of Galveston County, Texas. The plaintiff seeks monetary relief of $250,000 or less, excluding interest, statutory or...
Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 12, 2021Order
Date: October 18, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: October 15, 2021Correspondence
Date: October 15, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: September 20, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: September 16, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 20, 2021Citation by Rule 106 Issuance - Work Product
Date: August 20, 2021Order for Substituted Service
Date: August 18, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: August 17, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 17, 2021Motion for Substituted Service
Date: August 17, 2021Correspondence from Court
Date: August 12, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 04, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 04, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: May 12, 2021Correspondence from Court
Date: May 17, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: May 12, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: May 12, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: May 12, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: May 12, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Case Disposed IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. 08/12/2021 Reset by Court to 10/07/2021 10/07/2021 Reset by Court to 12/09/2021 |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Notice of Nonsuite with Prejudice Order (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) Order on Notice of Nonsuite with Prejudice |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE SIGNED KLN/law. ORDER OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE SIGNED KLN/law. |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order-Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter - Notice of Nonsuit Correspondence Cover Letter - Notice of Nonsuit |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service_filing_package Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Return of Service Return of Service |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) Set for 12/09/2021 at 9:00 am / Status Conference Set for 12/09/2021 at 9:00 am / Status Conference |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Receipt Acknowledge | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation by Rule 106 Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 citation @ $8.00 along with status conference. Emailed to ABC Legal / RG *** Issued 1 citation @ $8.00 along with status conference. Emailed to ABC Legal / RG *** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.