Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Leslie, Lisa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mark S. Byrne, against Wheatley, Edwin Allen, Jr., represented by Karalynn C. Cromeens, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrady, Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt - Commercial/Consumer |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Request for Civil Service
Date: March 11, 2021Order
Date: April 27, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 26, 2022Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: April 26, 2022Rule 11 Agreement
Date: April 12, 2022Rule 11 Agreement
Date: February 16, 2022Designation of Witness
Date: February 14, 2022Designation of Witness
Date: January 14, 2022Attorney Vacation Letter
Date: December 17, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: November 19, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 17, 2021Notice of Change of Address
Date: October 05, 2021Certificate
Date: September 01, 2021Rule 11 Agreement
Date: August 27, 2021Attorney Vacation Letter
Date: August 06, 2021Original Answer
Date: August 02, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: July 14, 2021Order for Substituted Service
Date: June 14, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 11, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: April 06, 2021Motion for Substituted Service
Date: June 11, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: April 05, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: April 06, 2021Amended Petition
Date: April 05, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 12, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 11, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: March 12, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: March 11, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: March 11, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Settled CANCELED Jury Trial (9:05 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Settled |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Disposition Setting Settled CANCELED Disposition Setting (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Settled |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) Of Nonsuit & Dismissal Of Nonsuit & Dismissal |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED - ORDER OF NONSUIT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PG/JF SIGNED - ORDER OF NONSUIT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PG/JF |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
P. Order Granting Nonsuit - Leslie Proposed Order (unsigned) Proposed Order Granting Nonsuit Proposed Order Granting Nonsuit |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit - Leslie Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA Notice of Nonsuit Notice of Nonsuit |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Signed Final Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Agreement Executed Rule 11 Agreement Executed Rule 11 Agreement |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement - Disclosures Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Agreement - Disclosures |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation of Expert Witnesses Designation of Witness Defendant's Designation of Expert Witnesses Defendant's Designation of Expert Witnesses |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Designation of Experts Designation of Witness Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.