Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael A. Moss, against Morton, Thomas W, represented by Christopher G Ayres, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: March 31, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: March 22, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 26, 2021Original Answer
Date: February 16, 2021Correspondence
Date: March 26, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 15, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 15, 2021Correspondence
Date: January 15, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: January 20, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: January 14, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: January 15, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: January 14, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: January 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Case Disposed IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED KLN/law. AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED KLN/law. |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Agreed Judgment Proposed Order (unsigned) Proposed Agreed Judgment |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence-Letter to Clerk Correspondence-Cover Letter - Re: Agreed Correspondence Correspondence-Cover Letter - Re: Agreed |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
ROS-AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE1 Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Original Answer |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) Status Conference Set For 04/15/2021 @ 9:00 am Status Conference Set For 04/15/2021 @ 9:00 am |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Emailed Status Conf. Sheet to Atty. Emailed Status Conf. Sheet to Atty. |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge E-mail confirmation for 1 Citation E-mail confirmation for 1 Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.