Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Degrasse, Donald D, against Ursula Reed, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllisor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
This complaint is a Plaintiff's Original Petition filed by American Express National Bank against Ursula Reed, also known as U. Darla Reed. The plaintiff seeks monetary relief of $100,000.00 or less, including damages, penalties, costs, expenses, pre...
Original Petition - OCA
Date: January 11, 2021Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA
Date: August 03, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: August 04, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 29, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 29, 2021Motion for Default Judgment
Date: June 15, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 15, 2021Certificate of Non-Military Status
Date: June 15, 2021Certificate of Last Known Address
Date: June 15, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: May 04, 2021Order for Substituted Service
Date: April 22, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 20, 2021Motion for Substituted Service
Date: April 20, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: January 28, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: January 12, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 12, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 12, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: January 12, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: January 11, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: January 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Other CANCELED Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) Other NO APPEARANCE (PARTIES TO SUBMIT DCO) 04/15/2021 Reset by Court to 06/17/2021 06/17/2021 Reset by Court to 08/05/2021 |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order of Dismisal Proposed Order (unsigned) ORDER OF DISMISSAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
P/O - Default Judgment Proposed Order (unsigned) Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Non Military Status Certificate of Non-Military Status Certificate of Non Military Status |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address Certificate of Last Known Address | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT TO CLAIM Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT TO CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.