Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jesse Dow Lockhart, against Lopez, Travis A, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2019 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Motion for Default Judgment
Date: January 14, 2020Copy of Notice
Date: January 15, 2020Judgment - Final - Default - OCA
Date: January 14, 2020Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 14, 2020Motion for Default Judgment
Date: January 14, 2020Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: November 21, 2019Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: December 16, 2019Receipt Acknowledge
Date: November 18, 2019Citation by Rule 106 Issuance - Work Product
Date: November 18, 2019Order for Substituted Service
Date: November 15, 2019Motion for Substituted Service
Date: November 14, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 14, 2019Request for Civil Service
Date: November 14, 2019Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: October 04, 2019Receipt Acknowledge
Date: September 03, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: October 30, 2019Status Conference Sheet
Date: August 31, 2019Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 31, 2019Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: September 03, 2019Original Petition - OCA
Date: August 30, 2019Request for Civil Service
Date: August 30, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 14, 2020Request for Civil Service
Date: August 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Case Disposed (*RESET FROM 11/21/19.) IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (*RESET FROM 11/21/19.) IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for DJ Motion for Default Judgment |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment - Final - Default - OCA (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed DJ-Order Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Granting Default Judgment Order Granting Default Judgment |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for DJ Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED KLN/law. DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED KLN/law. |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed DJ-Order Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Granting Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.