Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Massey, John Edward, Iii, Ross, Jasmine Jameka, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 306th District Court with Darring, Anne B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryAg (Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Establishment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House306th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Non Suit - Final - OCA Notice of Nonsuit |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition FIRST AMENDED Original Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship (AOP) |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Resetting Hearing/Trial | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena and Return - Executed | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Resetting Hearing/Trial | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation and Return | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Precept and Return | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
AG Hearing Notice - Precept Issuance - Work Product $8 with Certification Page |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | AG Citation - Issuance - Work Product $8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.