Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Vince Handler, against Weeks, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2018 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: September 19, 2018Motion for Default Judgment
Date: November 14, 2018Copy of Notice
Date: December 11, 2018Copy of Notice
Date: November 20, 2018Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 14, 2018Amended Judgment
Date: December 10, 2018Default Judgment - Final
Date: November 19, 2018Receipt Acknowledge
Date: September 19, 2018Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: October 04, 2018Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: September 20, 2018Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: September 28, 2018Receipt Acknowledge
Date: September 20, 2018Status Conference Sheet
Date: September 19, 2018Original Petition - OCA
Date: September 19, 2018Request for Civil Service
Date: September 19, 2018OCA Case Information Sheet
Date: September 19, 2018Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 14, 2018Amended Judgment
Date: December 10, 2018Motion for Default Judgment
Date: November 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Other CANCELED Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) Other |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Judgment (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Judgment Default Judgment |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment - Final (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) Amended 12-10-18 Amended 12-10-18 |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment - Final Amended 12-10-18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.