Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Frazier, Holly Madeline, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Frazier, Jarrett Dale, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 2 with Roberts, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 2 |
Docket Control Order
Date: April 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
TRO Hearing Atty Shipley |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mediated Settlement Agreement for Temporary Orders Settlement Agreement |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | TRO Hearing | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service. Citation. Transfer Citation and Return |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service. TRO Temporary Restraining Order and Return |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order - Issued - OCA - Work Product -hw |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Email Verification - Service Receipt -hw |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product -hw |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.