Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernandez, Walter Ernesto, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hernandez, Norma, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 1 with Grady, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce Decree - Agreed - OCA -hw |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Entry Hearing | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Reporter's Case Notes Reported by Bitty Erskine |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Uncontested. P, R and counsel for each. On record. Decree signed. |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Final Decree of Divorce /s/ JG |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
HERNANDEZ, NORMA - CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION Certificate of Completion - 4 Hours - Co Parenting/Divorce Class |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mediation Agreement Mediated Settlement Agreement |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order s/s/ Lisa Burkhalter-Order On Motion For Subsidized Mediation-jb |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSIDIZED MEDIATION | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Designation of Witness Petitioner's Designation of Expert Witnesses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.