Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Guillory, Shawndra Renea, Irving, Richard Terrence, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 3 with Ewing, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategoryAg (Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 3 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Order of Non-Suit/Dismissal /s/ JDE |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Status Conference IV-D Service |
|
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | AG Hearing Notice - Precept Issuance - Work Product $8 | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | OCA Case Information Sheet | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | RPPA - Initial - Orig Pet to Est Paty - $50 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.