Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brown, Christopher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brown, Kristina Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 3 with Ewing, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 3 |
Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 27, 2017Order for Mediation - ADR
Date: January 04, 2018Motion for Subsidized Mediation
Date: January 04, 2018Counter Petition
Date: April 06, 2017Original Petition - OCA
Date: February 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies Emailed to AG 04/08/2020 WCD |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Green Card Returned/Delivered | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Final Decree of Divorce /s/ JDE |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Petitioner appeared with counsel and proved up divorce. Final Decree was signed and entered. JDE |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Divorce Decree - Agreed - OCA | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Chris Brown, Certificate of Completion - Parent Education and Family Stabilization Course Certificate of Completion - Parent Education and Family Stabilization Course |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Entry Hearing | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Wage Assignment for Child Support - Issued - Work Product |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.