Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Clark, James W., Iii, Clark, Martha J., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Eddie M. Krenek, Krenek, Eddie M., against Black, Melissa Lee, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Real Property - Ownership/Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Release of Judgment
Date: June 12, 2020Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: December 31, 2019Abstract of Judgment - Issuance (Work Product)
Date: December 31, 2019Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: December 31, 2019Release of Judgment
Date: June 12, 2020Judgment - Final - Non Jury - OCA
Date: December 26, 2019Copy of Notice
Date: December 27, 2019Motion
Date: December 13, 2019Exhibit Inventory Filed by Court Reporter
Date: August 13, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: December 13, 2019Exhibit Inventory Filed by Court Reporter
Date: August 13, 2019Exhibit Inventory Filed by Court Reporter
Date: August 13, 2019Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Date: August 30, 2019Copy of Notice
Date: September 03, 2019Order Resetting Hearing/Trial
Date: June 25, 2019Response
Date: June 21, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 21, 2019Deputy Reporter Statement
Date: July 09, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: June 24, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: June 17, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: June 13, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 13, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 29, 2019Order Granting Motion to Withdrawal Counsel
Date: June 10, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 30, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: May 29, 2019Amended Answer
Date: April 15, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 14, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: April 05, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: May 10, 2018Designation of Witness
Date: April 01, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: November 15, 2018Correspondence from Attorney
Date: November 16, 2018Designation of Witness
Date: August 10, 2018Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 09, 2018Original Answer
Date: May 03, 2018Correspondence
Date: April 16, 2018Affidavit
Date: April 16, 2018Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 21, 2018Motion for Substituted Service
Date: March 21, 2018Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: January 03, 2018Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 02, 2018Citation Returned Unexecuted
Date: January 30, 2018Status Conference Sheet
Date: January 02, 2018Request for Civil Service
Date: December 30, 2017OCA Case Information Sheet
Date: December 30, 2017Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 30, 2017Motion
Date: December 13, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: June 24, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 13, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 21, 2019Order Granting Motion to Withdrawal Counsel
Date: June 10, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 29, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: May 29, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: November 15, 2018Docket Control Order
Date: April 05, 2019Designation of Witness
Date: April 01, 2019Designation of Witness
Date: August 10, 2018Docket Control Order
Date: May 10, 2018Original Answer
Date: May 03, 2018Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 30, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Black - Release of Judgment Lien Release of Judgment |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Black - Release of Judgment Lien Release of Judgment Release of Judgment |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Miscellaneous (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs Result: Held Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Miscellaneous Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) Hearing On Statement Of Inability To Afford Payment Of Court Costs 01/17/20 @ 1100am Hearing On Statement Of Inability To Afford Payment Of Court Costs 01/17/20 @ 1100am |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issuance (Work Product) Issued 1 abstract at $8.00. Mailed to attorney. Issued 1 abstract at $8.00. Mailed to attorney. |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) Hearing On Statement Of Inability To Afford Payment Of Court Costs. 01/17/220 @ 1100am Hearing On Statement Of Inability To Afford Payment Of Court Costs. 01/17/220 @ 1100am |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date Hearing On Statement Of Inability To Afford Payment Of Court Costs 01/17/20 @ 1100am |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issuance (Work Product) Issued 1 abstract at $8.00. Mailed to attorney. |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date Hearing On Statement Of Inability To Afford Payment Of Court Costs. 01/17/220 @ 1100am |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.