Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Thomas, Judy Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Aronowitz, Mark, against Cosey, Danisha Le'Shawn, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 3 with Ewing, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship - No Divorce (Sapcr) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 3 |
Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA
Date: August 01, 2018Order Granting Reinstatement - OCA
Date: October 04, 2017Motion to Reinstate
Date: September 18, 2017Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 18, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Address Not Updated-jb |
|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Order of Dismissal /s/ JDE |
|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice em copy to atty -hw |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA -hw |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Petitioner failed to appear for final disposition. Case is to be Dismissed. JDE |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Disposition Setting set per reinstatement order |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date Mark Aronowitz |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granting Reinstatement - OCA | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice.TrialSetting-signed Notice of Trial Setting |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Order on Petitioner's Motion to Reinstate /s/ JDE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.