Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Milner, Robert Thomas, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Shane, Kristie Leigh, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 1 with Grady, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 1 |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 22, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 18, 2017Motion to Withdraw
Date: August 18, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Attorney General as Necessary Party and Change of Payee |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Uncontested. R/Counter P and counsel. P/Counter R had notice to appear, failed to do so and is wholly in default. On record. Decree signed. |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice -hw |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce Decree - Default - OCA -hw |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Reporter's Case Notes Reported by Bitty Erskine |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order jb |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Withdrawal Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.