Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garner, Ashley, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Daily, John Robert, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 1 with Grady, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship - Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 1 |
Request for Copies
Date: September 13, 2016Rule 11 Agreement
Date: June 24, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: December 31, 2015Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Wage Withholding Order Order Withholding from Earnings for Child Support (to Employer) |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Garner Request for CC Request for Copies 9/16/16 completed- SD |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (unsigned) Wage Wihholding Order |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Child Support Set up Sheet Child Support Account Form |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (unsigned) Judgment in suit to Adjudicate Parentage |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order - Final - Non Jury - OCA Judgment in Suit to Adjudicate Parentage |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Reporter's Case Notes Reported by Bitty Erskine |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Daily - Rule 11 Agreement (Trial Continuance) Rule 11 Agreement |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - From Court of Setting Date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.