Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mccord, Jason Oscar, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Roberson, Morgan Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 1 with Grady, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship - No Divorce (Sapcr) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 1 |
Correspondence
Date: January 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order - Post Judgment Family Motion - Final - OCA Order Confirming Support Arrearage |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Precept and Return | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation and Return | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
AG Hearing Notice - Precept Issuance - Work Product $8 with Certification Page |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | AG Citation - Issuance - Work Product $8 | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
MRED Enforcement - Confirm CS Arrearage $15 MRED |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
OCA Case Information Sheet CCIS |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
0603E_GALVESTON_0013393016_13 Notice of Attorney General as Necessary Party NOAA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.