Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pitre, Amber N., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Boyle, Paul J., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 306th District Court with Darring, Anne B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2015 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship - No Divorce (Sapcr) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House306th District Court |
Request for Copies
Date: April 06, 2016Remit Letter for Costs - File Copy
Date: December 28, 2015Receipt of Documents (Transfer)
Date: December 23, 2015Receipt of Documents (Transfer)
Date: December 23, 2015Receipt of Documents (Transfer)
Date: December 23, 2015Receipt of Documents (Transfer)
Date: December 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Undeliverable | |
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Wage Assignment for Child Support - Issued - Work Product | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Notice to Empl to Withhold Income from Earnings 4/12/16 M/PS |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Green Card Returned/Delivered | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies 04/07/2016 Mailed / E. Nevelow |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Wage Assignment for Child Support - Issued - Work Product | |
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Wage Withholding Order Original Income Withholding Order/Notice for Support (IWO) |
|
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship |
|
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship and Income Withholding for Support signed. abd |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.