Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
English, Jacob Daniel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against English, Jessica Jean, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 1 with Grady, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 1 |
Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: December 23, 2015Motion to Substitute Counsel
Date: June 20, 2019Order on Motion for Subsidized ADR Procedures
Date: April 19, 2016Correspondence to Court
Date: April 22, 2016Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial continued from July 1, 2019 |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order - Post Judgment Family Motion - Final - OCA Order for Sanctions and Final Order Dismissing Case Without Prejudice -hw |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials hrg held; Bitty Erskine, ct rptr; Mtn for Sanctions Granted; case dismissed without opposition as sanctions; Pet ordered to pay atty fees and costs total $4,627.42; Resp counsel to file proposed order today. /s/ Judge Roberts |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (unsigned) Order for Sanctions |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference continued from July 1, 2019----SANCTIONS HRG / MTN FOR MEDIATION |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing -GB |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Mediation -hw |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Motion for Medication |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions and Notice of Hearing |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial continued from May 6th tr setting. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.