Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Whittington, Jesse, Whittington, Sandy, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Estes, Joshua, Joshua Estes, against Tony'S Used Cars Inc., represented by James Nathan Overstreet, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Slaughter, Michelle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2015 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House405th District Court |
Exhibit(s)
Date: June 02, 2016Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA
Date: May 11, 2016Agreed Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA
Date: June 27, 2016Exhibit(s)
Date: June 02, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: June 07, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 23, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 23, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 02, 2016Exhibit(s)
Date: June 02, 2016Motion to Reinstate
Date: June 02, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 02, 2016Exhibit(s)
Date: June 02, 2016Copy of Notice
Date: May 16, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 12, 2016Objection
Date: May 12, 2016Certificate
Date: May 11, 2016Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA
Date: May 11, 2016Proposed Charge of the Court
Date: May 05, 2016Copy of Notice
Date: December 17, 2015Notice of Hearing
Date: October 20, 2015Witness List
Date: May 05, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 11, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 05, 2016Motion
Date: May 05, 2016Order Denying Summary Judgment
Date: December 14, 2015Docket Control Order
Date: September 23, 2015Certificate
Date: October 08, 2015Request for Hearing
Date: September 21, 2015Correspondence
Date: September 21, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 16, 2015Request for Hearing
Date: September 21, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 27, 2015Agreed Motion
Date: September 16, 2015Agreed Motion
Date: September 16, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 16, 2015Citation and Return
Date: July 01, 2015Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 27, 2015Citation by Certified Mail Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 25, 2015Request for Civil Service
Date: June 25, 2015Request for Hearing
Date: August 27, 2015Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 25, 2015Original Answer
Date: July 01, 2015OCA Case Information Sheet
Date: June 25, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 23, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 23, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 02, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 11, 2016Exhibit(s)
Date: June 02, 2016Motion to Modify
Date: June 02, 2016Certificate
Date: May 11, 2016Exhibit(s)
Date: June 02, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 02, 2016Motion to Reinstate
Date: June 02, 2016Objection
Date: May 12, 2016Motion
Date: May 05, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 05, 2016Original Answer
Date: July 01, 2015Correspondence
Date: September 21, 2015Agreed Motion
Date: September 16, 2015Agreed Motion
Date: September 16, 2015Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 27, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 27, 2015Request for Civil Service
Date: June 25, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Slaughter, Michelle ) AGREED ORDER VACATING PREVIOUS ORDER AND DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS W/O PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER VACATING PREVIOUS ORDER AND DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS W/O PREJUDICE |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Agreed Order Vacating Previous Order and Dismissing Pltfs Claims w/o prejudice Agreed Order Vacating Previous Order and Dismissing Pltfs Claims w/o prejudice |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Slaughter, Michelle) Mtn to Reinstate Mtn to Reinstate |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA AGREED ORDER VACATING PREVIOUS ORDER AND DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS W/O PREJUDICE |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Agreed Order Vacating Previous Order and Dismissing Pltfs Claims w/o prejudice |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing Mtn to Reinstate |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
16.06.22 proposed order Proposed Order (unsigned) ORDER VACATING PREVIOUS ORDER AND ENTERING AN ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR WANT OF PROCECUTION ORDER VACATING PREVIOUS ORDER AND ENTERING AN ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR WANT OF PROCECUTION |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
16.06.22.executed proposed order Proposed Order (unsigned) VACATING PREVIOUS ORDER AND ENTERING AN ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR WANT OF PROCECUTION VACATING PREVIOUS ORDER AND ENTERING AN ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR WANT OF PROCECUTION |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
16.06.22.executed proposed order Proposed Order (unsigned) VACATING PREVIOUS ORDER AND ENTERING AN ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR WANT OF PROCECUTION |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
16.06.22 proposed order Proposed Order (unsigned) ORDER VACATING PREVIOUS ORDER AND ENTERING AN ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR WANT OF PROCECUTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.