Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Buccella, William, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Buccella, Tammy, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 306th District Court with Darring, Anne B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House306th District Court |
OCA Case Information Sheet
Date: September 12, 2017Motion
Date: June 05, 2015Order Granting Motion
Date: March 16, 2018Docket Control Order
Date: March 09, 2018Request for Service
Date: September 12, 2017Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 21, 2016Order on Motion for Subsidized ADR Procedures
Date: November 18, 2016Order for Mediation - ADR
Date: November 21, 2016Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 17, 2016Designation of Expert Witness
Date: October 05, 2016Docket Control Order
Date: August 23, 2016Original Answer
Date: May 20, 2016Financial Information Statement
Date: April 20, 2016Request for Service
Date: April 19, 2016Wage Withholding Order
Date: August 28, 2015Request for Notice to Empl to Withhold Income from Earnings
Date: August 26, 2015Correspondence from Attorney
Date: July 14, 2015Designation of Expert Witness
Date: June 09, 2015Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 05, 2015Wage Withholding Order
Date: May 19, 2015Docket Control Order
Date: April 27, 2015Rule 11 Agreement
Date: April 24, 2015Counter Petition
Date: March 19, 2015Original Answer
Date: March 19, 2015Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 23, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Claim Form - Approved (File Copy) | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order - Post Judgment Family Motion - Final - OCA Notice of Nonsuit without Prejudice -hw DCSD |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court Order Granting Nonsuit withhout Prejudice MM |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Pretrial. Pro-se Petitioner and Respondent appeared. Case to proceed as scheduled on May 17, 9:30 a.m. abd |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ltr to Judge Darring; Cause No. 14-FD-3160 Correspondence |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Completion 4-Hour Co-Parenting/Divorce Case | |
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion For Subsidized Mediation /S/ Lisa Burkhart |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Subsidized Mediation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.