Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Galvan- Morales, Pedro, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Alvarado- Velasquez, Maria Elsy, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 2 with Roberts, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoberts, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Galvan-Morales Nonsuit Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Return of Service-Galvan Citation and Return |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Attorney | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Issuance of Service-Galvan Request for Service 1/29/2015 iss o/c cit; called atty; put in cust serv drawer @ 4:00PM; pks m to process server/PS |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Amended Petition for Divorce | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Issuance - Work Product | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - OCA Petition |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Status Conference Sheet | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Info.- Galvan OCA Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.